judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00295-CV
08-89-00295-CV
08/21/1989
Contract
Valero Transmission Co. & Valero Transmission, L.P.
Wagner & Brown, II, A Partnership
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/30/1990Shuck purged
10/30/1990Mandate Issued
10/30/1990Mandate Issued
09/21/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
09/21/1990Decision from Supreme Court or CCADismissed
06/18/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
06/08/1990Application for Writ of Error
06/08/1990Fee paid
05/29/1990Fee paid
05/18/1990Fee paid
05/09/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/1990Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
05/09/1990Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
05/09/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/26/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
04/26/1990Fee paid
04/26/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/11/1990Payment of fee due requested
04/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/09/1990Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
03/28/1990Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
03/22/1990Brief Filed
03/22/1990Submitted
03/22/1990Submission
03/22/1990Submitted
03/16/1990Brief Filed
02/12/1990Miscellaneous filing
02/09/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/09/1990Order entered
02/08/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
01/31/1990Submission
01/10/1990Brief Filed
01/10/1990Case ready to be set
01/10/1990Case ready to be set
12/20/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/14/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
12/08/1989Fee paid
12/06/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/06/1989Payment of fee due requested
11/15/1989Brief Filed
11/08/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/27/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
09/01/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
08/31/1989Exhibits Filed
08/31/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/28/1989Fee paid
08/21/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/21/1989Payment of fee due requested
08/21/1989Transcript Filed
08/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellantHon. Roger Townsend
UnknownAppelleeHon. Kleber C. Miller
UnknownAppelleeHon. Anne Gardner
Trial Court Information
142nd District Court
Midland
Honorable Pat M. Baskin
A-36,160