judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00990-CR
05-89-00990-CR
08/21/1989
Other Drug Possession
Seabolt, III, James H.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2020Order enteredDestroy
08/19/1992Mandate Issued
08/19/1992Mandate Issued
08/10/1992Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCAMotion or Writ Denied
07/21/1992Case Returned from Higher Ct.
06/22/1992Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
04/23/1992Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
04/23/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/23/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/26/1992Submission
02/26/1992Submitted
02/26/1992Submission
02/26/1992Submitted
01/29/1992MattConv
12/04/1991Case ready to be set
12/04/1991Brief Filed
12/04/1991Letter Filed
12/04/1991Case ready to be set
11/13/1991Letter Filed
10/10/1991Letter Sent by the Court
10/09/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.Reversed & Remanded to Ct. App
06/24/1991Opinion issuedReversed & Remanded to Ct. App
05/14/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledMotion or Writ Granted
04/18/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Denied
04/13/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/13/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
04/10/1990Response to Motion
03/27/1990Exhibits Filed
03/20/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
03/13/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/12/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/27/1990Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/23/1990Response to Motion
02/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/14/1990Brief Filed
02/14/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/14/1990Motion to Supplement Record
01/26/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/12/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/13/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/11/1989Statement of Facts Filed
12/07/1989Affidavit Filed
12/06/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/18/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/1989Transcript Filed
09/05/1989Transcript Tendered
08/30/1989Response to Motion
08/21/1989Motion for Leave to File
08/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
F88-68489-SR
5 years deferred probation