judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5771
B-5771
01/21/1976
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT WEBB, ET AL.
IRYS EAKIN AND DOCTORS GENERAL HOSPITAL, DR. KENNETH L. JORNS, M.D. AND E.D. OLCOTT, M.D.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/15/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/11/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
02/06/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
01/21/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/19/1976Response to Motion filed
04/19/1976Response to Motion filed
04/15/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/11/1976Response to Petition
02/06/1976Response to Petition
01/21/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/21/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert Webb, et al.Petitioner
Irys Eakin and Doctors General HospitalRespondent
Dr. Kenneth L. Jorns, M.D. and E.D. Olcott, M.D.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information