judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00277-CR
07-89-00277-CR
08/21/1989
Theft
Texas, The State of
Bell, Thomas C., and Johnny Mack Brown, acting together
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/26/1990Mandate Issued
02/06/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/12/1990Submission
09/26/1989Case ready to be set
09/26/1989Brief Filed
09/26/1989Brief Filed
09/11/1989Brief Filed
08/28/1989Do not use
08/21/1989Do not use
08/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/26/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Potter
Honorable Samuel C. Kiser
52728