judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1287
B-1287
01/06/1969
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS MACHINERY AND EQUIPMENT COMPANY, INC., ET AL.
GORDON KNOX OIL AND EXPLORATION COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/25/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/25/1969Post submission brief filedRespondent
03/21/1969Response to Brief filedPetitioner
03/07/1969Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/20/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/30/1969Response to Motion filed
06/25/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/11/1969Dissenting opinion issued.
06/11/1969Opinion issued
03/25/1969Post submission brief filed
03/21/1969Response to Brief filed
03/11/1969Miscellaneous Motion
03/07/1969Supplemental Brief filed
02/12/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/12/1969Document received (See Remarks)
01/20/1969Response to Petition
01/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/06/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gordon Knox Oil and Exploration CompanyRespondent
Texas Machinery and Equipment Company, Inc., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information