judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROWN (DERRICK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38288
Short Caption:BROWN (DERRICK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39688
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C172673Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-13526
09/17/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. STRICKEN BY ORDER 09/25/01. 01-15662
09/18/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Fast Statement. 01-15795
09/20/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Verfication to Fast Track Statement. STRICKEN BY ORDER 09/25/01. 01-15885
09/25/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The State's motion to strike the fast track statement is granted. The clerk shall strike the fast track statement filed on September 17, 2001. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days within which to file and serve a fast track statement and appendix that comport with the requirements of NRAP 3C(e), or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with NRAP 3C. 01-16168
10/12/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-17237
11/14/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On October 12, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily. The motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-18964
11/14/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.