judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NATHAN HANS SWAIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0280)
Case Number:S-08-0280Case Docketed On:12/23/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:NATHAN HANS SWAIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:NATHAN HANS SWAIN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNathan Hans SwainDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contempt, Criminal Law -Probation, Criminal Law -Sentencing -Credit for Time Served
Opinion Number:2009 WY 142
Citation:220 P.3d 504

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/23/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/09/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/10/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/24/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/30/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/14/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/23/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcipts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/02/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
11/19/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/23/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - opinion signed for 11/20/09 by agent for Warden of Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/07/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/07/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/09/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for 12/8/09 by agent for warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/10/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/9/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal