judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GOLAM AKHTER V. MOHAMED SHAFIQULLAH

Case Information: 10-CV-1471
Short Caption:GOLAM AKHTER V. MOHAMED SHAFIQULLAHClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5042-10Filed Date:11/19/2010

Opening Event Date:11/19/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/10/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/29/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/03/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/10/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGolam Akhter N
Philip B. ZipinYY
AppelleeMohamed Shafiqullah N
Morris R. BattinoYN
Aaron SokolowYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/07/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 19, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
12/10/2010RECORD INDEX
12/10/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/14/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
01/24/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/24/2011APPENDIX
03/02/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant and the appendix were filed with this court on January 24, 2011, and it further appearing that the brief of appellee was due to be filed on or before February 28, 2011, (See D.C. App. R. 31, but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (JAC) elp
03/11/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
03/11/2011RECEIVED - aple's brief
03/11/2011RECEIVED - aple's appdx
03/29/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for leave to file the lodged brief and appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged brief of appellee and the appendix are filed. It is (MORE)
03/29/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/29/2011APPENDIX
03/29/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/29/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be schedule for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC) elp
04/08/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/15/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY of Judgement or in the alternative, for Expedited Appeal.
06/20/2011TMC - motion to stay JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL or to expedite
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/01/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
07/08/2011FiledOrder Denying MOTION FOR STAY W/O PREJUDICE and DENYING MTOION TO EXPEDITE
07/12/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (aplt)
08/30/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
09/08/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/03/2011FiledArgued before Chief Judge Washington, Judges Fisher, King
12/19/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and King, Senior Judge)
01/10/2012FiledMandate