judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8980
C-8980
08/21/1989
App Writ of Error
BONNIE ALTMAN INDIVIDUALLY and a/n/f of SAMUEL ALTMAN ET AL.
MOONEY AIRCRAFT CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/06/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent
11/27/1989Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/05/1989Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/21/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/14/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED
12/13/1989Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledREHEARING OVERRULED
12/06/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
11/30/1989Motion for Rehearing forwardedBOXED RECORD IN CLERK'S OFFICE
11/27/1989Motion for Rehearing
11/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
09/20/1989Petitioner's reply briefBRIEF IN RESPONSE AND REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
09/07/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/07/1989No description available.
09/05/1989Reply to Response
08/21/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/14/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
KENNETH ALTMANPetitionerMr. Richard N. Countiss
ERIC ALTMANPetitionerMr. Richard N. Countiss
STANLEY B. ALTMANPetitionerMr. Richard N. Countiss
SAMUEL ALTMANPetitionerMr. Richard N. Countiss
MILDRED ALTMANPetitionerMr. Richard N. Countiss
BONNIE ALTMANPetitionerMr. Richard N. Countiss
LAWRENCE STUART ALTMAN DECEASEPetitionerMr. Richard N. Countiss
DAVID ALTMANPetitionerMr. Richard N. Countiss
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-01175-CV
Reversed & Remanded
772 SW2d 540, 05-26-89
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable JAMES A. BAKER
Trial Court Information
191st District Court
Dallas
Honorable Bill F. Coker
83-11868-J