judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00788-CR
14-89-00788-CR
08/21/1989
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Williams, Jr., Frank Marcus
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/24/1992Case stored
03/11/1992Mandate Issued
03/11/1992Mandate Issued
02/25/1992Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
02/13/1992Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STADENIED
01/29/1992Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
12/18/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
12/06/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/07/1991Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
10/23/1991Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
10/10/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/10/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/01/1991Submitted
10/01/1991Submission
10/01/1991Submitted
09/03/1991Submission
05/24/1991Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/24/1991Case ready to be set
05/24/1991Case ready to be set
05/16/1991Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/09/1991Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/11/1991Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/11/1991Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/03/1991Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/29/1991Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
03/14/1991Order Entered
02/14/1991Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/07/1991Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/31/1991No description available.
01/10/1991Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/02/1991Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/29/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/16/1990No description available.
11/15/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/04/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/28/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/25/1990No description available.
08/23/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/23/1990Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
08/08/1990Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
07/13/1990No description available.
05/30/1990Hearing Record FILED
05/30/1990No description available.
05/24/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
04/16/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
03/22/1990Order Entered
02/13/1990No description available.
01/11/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
12/27/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
12/13/1989No description available.
11/02/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/13/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/05/1989No description available.
10/03/1989Transcript FILED
08/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/17/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
08/04/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/24/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasRoger A. Haseman
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantGeorge O. Jacobs
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable CALVIN MILBURN
514,081
5 years TDC Probated