judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9065
C-9065
09/19/1989
App Writ of Error
THE STATE BAR OF TEXAS
ERIC TURTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/17/1990Brief on the MeritsPetitionerRESPONSE TO MO TO DISMISS WITH VERI- FICATION, FILED 04-13-90.
04/13/1990Reply BriefRespondentTURTON'S REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL
04/11/1990Reply BriefPetitionerREPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS
12/20/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
09/19/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/03/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
05/30/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedMO TO DISMISS OR
05/30/1990Motion to dismiss disposedOverruledMO TO DISMISS APPEAL
04/17/1990Brief on the MeritsRESPONSE TO MO TO DISMISS WITH VERI- FICATION, FILED 04-13-90.
04/13/1990Reply BriefTURTON'S REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL
04/11/1990Reply BriefREPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS
04/03/1990Motion to dismiss application for writ of error
12/20/1989Reply to Response
10/12/1989Case forwarded to Court
10/12/1989No description available.
09/19/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/03/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
04-88-00485-CV
Reversed and Rendered
___SW2d___, 06-28-89
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable SHIRLEY W. BUTTS
Trial Court Information
37th District Court
Bexar
Honorable David Peeples
88-CI-5793