judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9067
C-9067
09/19/1989
App Writ of Error
REVEREND ISAAC T. NELSON and GERALDINE NELSON
DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/27/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
09/19/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/12/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
01/17/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
09/28/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/28/1989No description available.
09/27/1989Reply to Response
09/19/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
02/12/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-01347-CV
Aff/Rev/Rem
774 SW2d 380, 06-29-89
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable GORDON ROWE
Trial Court Information
191st District Court
Dallas
86-6875-J