judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00446-CV
04-89-00446-CV
09/18/1989
Divorce
Antonio G. Cantu
Rosario Cantu
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/1992Original Exhibits Returned
02/18/1992Mandate Issued
02/18/1992Mandate Issued
02/14/1992Case Returned from Higher Court
01/08/1992Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
11/25/1991Information regarding cause received
11/20/1991Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
10/23/1991Information regarding cause received
10/21/1991No New Event but Update in Calendar
10/21/1991Writ of Error filed
10/10/1991Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/04/1991Writ of Error filed
09/09/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/09/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/09/1991Order Entered
09/09/1991Order Entered
09/09/1991Order Entered
09/09/1991Order Entered
05/06/1991Response to Motion Filed
05/02/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/29/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/17/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed in Part/Reversed & Remanded in Part
04/17/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed in Part/Reversed & Remanded in Part
10/12/1990Response to Motion Filed
10/12/1990Response to Motion Filed
10/11/1990Response to Motion Filed
10/11/1990Response to Motion Filed
10/11/1990Response to Motion Filed
09/28/1990Submitted
09/28/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/28/1990Submission
09/28/1990Submitted
09/26/1990Motion Filed
09/21/1990Reply brief filed
08/22/1990Submission
07/09/1990Case ready to be set
07/09/1990Requests Oral Argument
07/09/1990Brief Filed
07/09/1990Case ready to be set
07/06/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/25/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/19/1990Motion to Amend DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/19/1990Motion to Amend DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/19/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/05/1990Motion to Amend Filed
06/05/1990Exhibits received
06/05/1990Motion Filed
06/05/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/05/1990Exhibits Filed
05/24/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/30/1990Requests Oral Argument
04/30/1990Brief Filed
04/12/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/12/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/16/1990No Description Available.
01/08/1990No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
01/08/1990No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
01/08/1990No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
12/18/1989No Description Available.
10/10/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/10/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/27/1989No Description Available.
09/18/1989No Description Available.
09/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/18/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/22/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/18/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rosario CantuAppelleeKirk Patterson
John U. Hemmi
Antonio G. CantuAppellantHarry A. Nass, Jr.
Ron H. Mata
Trial Court Information
288th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable J. F. Clawson, Jr.
87-CI-08865
n/a