judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01117-CR
05-89-01117-CR
09/18/1989
Indecent Exposure
Burton, Matthew Scott
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/27/1990Mandate Issued
12/27/1990Mandate Issued
10/25/1990Record RetentionRetain
10/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/03/1990Submission
10/03/1990Submitted
10/03/1990Submission
10/03/1990Submitted
08/20/1990MattConv
03/20/1990Brief Filed
03/20/1990Case ready to be set
03/20/1990Case ready to be set
03/08/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/07/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/14/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/12/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/20/1989Brief Filed
11/20/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/17/1989Transcript Filed
10/25/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/20/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/18/1989Motion for Leave to File
09/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/27/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 9
Dallas
MA88-08341-K
90 days probated 12 mos