judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01119-CV
05-89-01119-CV
09/18/1989
Contract
Marshall Louis, MLM Properties, Lawrence F. Kern, III & Mal
Marshall Louis, MLM Properties, Lawrence F. Kern, III & Mal
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/14/1997Record RetentionDestroy
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
10/31/1989Order EnteredDismissed
10/31/1989Order EnteredDismissed
10/02/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
10/02/1989Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/1989MattConv
09/22/1989Extend Time to File Record
09/18/1989Extend Time to File Record
09/18/1989MattConv
09/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/24/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/26/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
193rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Larry W Baraka