judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-89-00256-CV
11-89-00256-CV
09/18/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Hardin, Lavoyd Wayne
Texas Employment Commission et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/30/1990Mandate issued
07/27/1990Case returned from higher court
06/25/1990Application for writ of error disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/30/1990Case forwarded to higher court
05/25/1990Application for writ of error
04/26/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
04/12/1990Mot. - For rehearing filed
03/29/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/15/1990Submitted
03/15/1990Submission set in Eastland
11/27/1989Submission set in Eastland
11/02/1989Case ready to be set
11/02/1989Brief filed
11/01/1989Brief filed
10/18/1989Record checked in
10/10/1989Brief filed
10/10/1989Record checked out
09/27/1989SF filed
09/18/1989TR filed
09/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/30/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hardin, Lavoyd WayneAppellantLavoyd Wayne `Bill` Hardin
Texas Employment CommissionAppelleeSylvia F. Hardman
Trial Court Information
220th District Court
Comanche
Honorable James Morgan, Judge (Retired)
92-89