judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01120-CV
05-89-01120-CV
09/18/1989
Mandamus
Ford Motor Company
Mark Whittington, Judge, 160th District Court, Dallas County
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/14/1997Record RetentionDestroy
09/20/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/20/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/18/1989MattConv
09/18/1989Motion for Leave to File
09/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Mark L. Whittington
87-11403-H