judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00302-CV
07-89-00302-CV
09/18/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Bennett, Bonnie d/b/a Allstates Bail Bond Company
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/27/1990Mandate Issued
10/09/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
10/02/1990Submitted
10/02/1990Submission
09/12/1990Submission
01/17/1990Response to any order, inquiry or motion
01/16/1990Motion to Strike Filed
11/14/1989Do not use
11/14/1989Motion to Supplement the Record DisposedGRANT
11/13/1989Brief Filed
11/13/1989Case ready to be set
11/03/1989Motion to Supplement the Record Filed
10/25/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
10/23/1989Letter of Inquiry filed
10/23/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/19/1989Brief Filed
10/19/1989Do not use
10/18/1989Do not use
10/16/1989Do not use
09/18/1989Do not use
09/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/27/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bennett, Bonnie D/b/a AllstateAppellantGeorge Gilkerson
Texas, The State OfAppelleeTravis S. Ware
Trial Court Information
237th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable John R. McFall
89-525,321