judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00386-CV
13-89-00386-CV
09/18/1989
Habeas Corpus
Ex parte: Brian Gregory Wilshusen, Relator
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/12/1989Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/05/1989Submitted
10/05/1989Submission
09/26/1989Brief Filed
09/26/1989Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
09/25/1989Reply Brief Filed
09/19/1989Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/19/1989Submission
09/19/1989Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
09/19/1989Filing Fee Paid
09/19/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
09/18/1989Filing Fee Paid
09/18/1989Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
09/18/1989Brief Filed
09/18/1989Brief received.
09/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/12/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
148th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Margarito Garza
83-1036-E