judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00870-CR
14-89-00870-CR
09/19/1989
Other Drug Sale or Delivery
Valladares, Arturo Garcia
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/16/1991Case stored
12/11/1990Mandate Issued
12/11/1990Mandate Issued
11/26/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/09/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
10/25/1990Opinion issuedREVERSED AND RENDERED
10/25/1990Opinion issuedREVERSED AND RENDERED
10/09/1990Memorandum of Authorities
10/09/1990Submitted
10/09/1990Submission
10/09/1990Submitted
09/12/1990Submission
05/04/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/04/1990Case ready to be set
05/04/1990Case ready to be set
04/12/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/06/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/09/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/01/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/22/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/21/1990No description available.
12/21/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/18/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/15/1989No description available.
11/14/1989Record Filed (Both records FILED)
11/07/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/15/1989Date of Sentence
09/15/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/16/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantStanley G. Schneider
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn Brook
Trial Court Information
174th District Court
Harris
Honorable GEORGE H. GODWIN
520,392
5 years TDC/$500 fine