judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00388-CR
13-89-00388-CR
09/19/1989
Unknown Criminal Case Type.
Anthony Arthur
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/05/1990Mandate Issued
12/04/1990Record checked in
11/21/1990Higher Court DecisionRefused
11/15/1990Court of Crim. Appeals Number
11/09/1990Cite for opinions
10/25/1990Letter sent
08/06/1990Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
07/25/1990Petition for Review
07/17/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
06/29/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/03/1990Address Change
02/13/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
01/18/1990Submitted
01/18/1990Submission
01/17/1990Brief Filed
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/20/1989Submission
11/28/1989Brief Filed
11/28/1989Case ready to be set
10/30/1989Transcript Filed
10/30/1989Due date for record to be filed
10/27/1989Statement of Facts Received
10/27/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/27/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
09/19/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/05/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Margarito Garza