judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00387-CR
13-89-00387-CR
09/19/1989
Assault & battery
Perez, Roberto
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/1991Mandate Issued
12/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/25/1990Submitted
10/25/1990Submission
09/04/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
08/31/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/28/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
08/28/1990Submission
08/23/1990Brief Filed
08/23/1990Brief received.
07/31/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/20/1990Brief Filed
06/20/1990Case ready to be set
05/31/1990Green card in
05/24/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/24/1990Order Entered
05/09/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/18/1990Address Change
03/08/1990Additional Copies of Misc. Motion
03/08/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/05/1990Miscellaneous Motion
02/22/1990Green card in
02/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/15/1990Order Entered
02/01/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/26/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/27/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
12/27/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/19/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/19/1989Address Change
10/09/1989Due date for record to be filed
10/03/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/27/1989Transcript Filed
09/19/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfAppelleeCarlos Garcia
Trial Court Information
139th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Margarito Garza
CR-1341-88-C
5 yrs probation