judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1276-89
PD-1276-89
09/19/1989
PDR Case Type
CAMPBELL, WILLIS D.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/27/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/27/1989RESPONSE FILED
09/19/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateTim Curry
CAMPBELL, WILLIS D.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Allan K. Butcher
Court of Appeals Information:
02-88-00122-CR
Aff 6-28-89
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable George S. Kredell
0317173D