judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1272-89
PD-1272-89
09/19/1989
PDR Case Type
FELDER, JOHN LEWIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/20/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
10/03/1989PDR FILED
09/19/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
FELDER, JOHN LEWISApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)George McCall Secrest, Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
06-88-00063-CR
Aff 9-12-89
6th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
Honorable MICHAEL T. MCSPADDEN
500774