judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1273-89
PD-1273-89
09/19/1989
PDR Case Type
RODRIGUEZ, ALFREDO JUARDARDO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/22/1989BRIEF FILEDAppellant
01/03/1989BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/04/1991MANDATE ISSD
09/18/1991REHEAR DISPDENIED
07/29/1991REHEAR EXT MOTIONGranted
07/29/1991REHEAR EXT MOTIONFiled
07/29/1991REHEAR FILED
07/03/1991OPINION ISSDDismissed as improvidently granted
07/03/1991OPINION ISSDDismissed as improvidently granted
05/16/1990SUBMITTED
02/28/1990SET FOR SUBMIS
12/22/1989BRIEF FILED
11/22/1989PDR DISPGranted
10/20/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/19/1989PDR FILED
01/03/1989BRIEF FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/04/1991STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Roach
Rodriguez, Alfredo JuardardoApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John P. Mustachio
Court of Appeals Information:
08-89-00112-CR
Aff 8-2-89
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
219th District Court
Collin
Honorable Richrd Schell
219-10020-87