judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TRACEY FUENTES and NF, a minor child v. MARGRED JEDNAT; PAUL JEDNAT; and JAMES LEWIS

Case Heading (S-09-0009)
Case Number:S-09-0009Case Docketed On:01/12/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:TRACEY FUENTES and NF, a minor child v. MARGRED JEDNAT; PAUL JEDNAT; and JAMES LEWIS
Full Title:TRACEY FUENTES, individually; and NF, a minor child, by and through her next best friend, parent and guardian, TRACEY FUENTES, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. MARGRED JEDNAT; PAUL JEDNAT; and JAMES LEWIS, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTracey FuentesWilliam R. Fix
Jenna V. Mandraccia
AppellantN FWilliam R. Fix
Jenna V. Mandraccia
AppelleeMargred JednatKatherine Lamere Mead
Bradford S. Mead
AppelleePaul JednatKatherine Lamere Mead
Bradford S. Mead
AppelleeJames LewisLaurence W. Stinson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Limitation of Actions, Negligence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 40
Citation:229 P.3d 949

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/12/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/12/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/28/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's opening brief; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/16/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees' Margred Jednat and Paul NednatEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/20/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/22/2009Service - Certificate of service (Amended)ServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
04/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee James LewisEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Amended Certificate of Service for Appellee Brief of James LewisEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for Appellee LewisNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
04/30/2009Event - Phone Call. Received call from counsel for appellant regarding dates for filing reply briefs. Advised she may file one reply brief to both appellees with due date calculated from last brief of appellee filed.EventPhone CallFinal
05/11/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bradford Mead for appellees Jednat.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/18/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/18/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/10/2009Event - Phone Call - contacted counsel for appellant regarding who will argue case. Received return phone call indicating that William Fix will argue.EventPhone CallFinal
06/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William Fix for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/15/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
06/15/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
06/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Motion to Vacate Oral Argument (Requested signed original from counsel)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bradford Mead for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Laurence Stinson for appellee Lewis.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/12/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (William R. Fix for appellants; Bradford S. Mead and Laurence W. Stinson for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/12/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/02/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/20/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/20/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/26/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal