judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JERVON LEMONT HERBIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1506
Short Caption:JERVON LEMONT HERBIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-13205-09Filed Date:11/29/2010

Opening Event Date:11/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/20/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/10/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/04/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJervon L. Herbin Y
James W. KleinNY
Lee R. GoebesNY
Jessica Brand YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Anne Y. ParkYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
03/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (25 pgs/Burr) 7/23/10 proc.
03/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (42 pgs/Davis) 8/12/10 proc.
03/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (457 pgs/McCarn) 8/16-20/10 proc.
03/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (458-986 pgs/McCarn) 8/23-27/10 proc.
03/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (26 pgs/Armstrong) 11/3/10 proc.
03/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/18/2011RECORD INDEX
03/18/2011RECORD COPIES
03/18/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (SEALED documents)
03/23/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/19/2011RECEIVED courtesy copy of pro se letter to court-appointed counsel regarding counsel's lack of communication to discuss appeal matters. (See Fileroom for Letter).
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo).
05/05/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 1, 2011. (JAC)
08/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - for 90 days Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion to file the brief and limited appendix to October 31, 2011.
09/12/2011LodgedReceived courtesy copy of pro se letter to court-appointed counsel regarding legal assistance and counsel's case load. (Appellant)
09/16/2011FiledLetter To counsel for appelllant referring the Sept. 12 pro se letter received from appellant.
10/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/16/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 1/30/12.
01/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
02/02/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 4/23/12.
04/23/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
04/23/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
05/23/2012LodgedMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
06/05/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 8/21/12.
08/21/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
08/30/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 9/20/12
09/20/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/20/2012FiledBriefing Completed
10/16/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
10/16/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
11/13/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
11/14/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/19/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/21/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
12/21/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/10/2013FiledArgued before Judges Washington, Fisher, Thompson
08/13/2013FiledReversed And Remanded (MOJ) Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges
09/04/2013FiledMandate