judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NOLCINI VS. BROWN

Case Information: 33472
Short Caption:NOLCINI VS. BROWNCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV14460Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/15/1998OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger.
12/15/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from David C. Polley--check no. 4209.
12/15/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00384
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/04/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00001
01/26/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 2/23/99 99-00517
02/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-00851
02/08/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-00852
02/18/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. Pursuant to the settlement conference and the stipulation of the parties " . . . this appeal is dismissed as to respondents Cathy Benoit, Century 21 Money World and Mike West only, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees." NRAP 42(b). 99-01082
03/05/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-01551
03/05/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-01552
03/05/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-01553
03/12/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 99-01774
03/12/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.