judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDRE J. BAKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1508
Short Caption:ANDRE J. BAKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-7674-09Filed Date:12/02/2010

Opening Event Date:12/02/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/16/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndre J. Baker Y
Lisa D. ChanelNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/02/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/15/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-981 and 10-CO-1508 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Lisa D. Chanel, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 10-CO-1508 herein. F/O that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall prepare and transmit the record index and record copies in appeal no. 10-CO-1508 to this court forthwith. F/O thatthe supplemental brief of appellant addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 10-CO-1508 shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the consolidated brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
01/25/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to suspend briefing schedule and extend time to file motion to dimiss 10CO1508 (no oppo)
02/24/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION - for extension of time within which to file motion to dismiss appeal on behalf of aplt
03/10/2011ORDERED that appellant's motions are granted and appellant shall file a motion to dismiss appeal no. 10-CO-1508 on or before April 4, 2011. (JAC)
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL case 10-CO-1508 (only) waiver attached
04/26/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeal nos. 10-CF-981 & 10-CO-1508 are hereby severed. F/O that the motion is granted and appeal no. 10-CO-1508 is hereby dismissed. See Johnson v. United States, 513 A.2d 798 (D.C. 1986). F/O that, in appeal no. 10-CF-981, the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW)
04/26/2011DISMISSED
06/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED