Case: B-1554
B-1554
01/05/1969
Application for Writ of Error
HARRY W. MARGOLIS, ET AL.
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/08/1969 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/11/1969 | Response to Petition | Petitioner | | |
06/02/1969 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
05/19/1969 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/08/1969 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/11/1969 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/02/1969 | Response to Petition | | ||
05/19/1969 | Conditional application for writ of error filed | | ||
05/19/1969 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
05/19/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
01/05/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Respondent | |
Harry W. Margolis, et al. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information