judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HENNAN (DONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34623
Short Caption:HENNAN (DONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39542 , 49046
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR5010Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-07220
08/23/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. "MISSING DOCUMENT." 99-07833
10/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve either a transcript request form or a certtificate of no transcript request. 99-10633
12/02/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 12/01/99. 99-12026
12/02/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-12027
12/03/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-12094
01/03/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 2, 2000. 00-00063
02/03/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 2/1/00. 00-01740
02/03/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-01741
04/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER this appeal dismissed." - SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. 00-05867
05/09/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-07573
05/09/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 15, 2000. 00-07573