judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID IRA FISH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0011)
Case Number:S-07-0011Case Docketed On:01/12/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DAVID IRA FISH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAVID IRA FISH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid Ira FishDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
Tina N. Olson
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Dana Jill Lent

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/12/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/01/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/02/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/13/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/16/2007Order - Grant - extension of time to file appellant's briefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/31/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
07/10/2007Brief - Appellee, received copy on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/10/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, Confidential FolderRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Dana Lent for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Donna Domonkos for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/05/2007Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
09/05/2007Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
10/05/2007Event - Phone Call - Contacted counsel for appellant regarding status of case since it was vacated becasue appelalnt wanted to waive appeal. She'll look into it.EventPhone CallFinal
10/08/2007Event - Phone Call - Received call from Ms. Kerin. She is unable to reach appellant by phone, and is not sure where he is. Apparently Washington let him go work in Alaska. She requested that the matter be set for argument, and if he is located and still wishes to waive appeal, she will file accordingly.EventPhone CallFinal
10/08/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
10/09/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/09/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/12/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal