judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HOPKINS, ARTHUR L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-0503
Short Caption:HOPKINS, ARTHUR L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3225-79Filed Date:04/24/1980

Opening Event Date:04/24/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/29/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/30/1982
Argued/Submitted:03/02/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOPKINS, ARTHUR L. UNITED STATES
04/24/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/29/1980FiledRecord Completed
12/30/1982FiledBriefing Completed
03/02/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/11/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition