judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00231-CV
02-89-00231-CV
09/18/1989
Automobile Personal Injury
Rhea, Billie J. Indiv.,and on Behalf of Arthur F. Rhea et al
Williams, Garry Lynn and Reeder Distributors, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/31/1991Letter to Attys to Pickup Exhibits-Mandate Issued
12/31/1991Mandate Issued
11/13/1991Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/17/1991Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/07/1991Writ Filed
02/05/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/29/1991Response Filed
01/24/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/09/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/31/1990Letter Brief Filed
10/01/1990Letter Brief Filed
09/18/1990Submitted
09/18/1990Submission
04/30/1990Motion for Continuance DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/24/1990Motion for Continuance Filed
03/29/1990Letter
03/22/1990Letter
03/21/1990Brief Filed
02/16/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/15/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/26/1990Brief Filed
01/18/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/18/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/04/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/01/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/14/1989No Description Available.
11/07/1989Submission
11/07/1989Exhibits Filed
11/07/1989No Description Available.
11/07/1989No Description Available.
09/18/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/31/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rhea, Estate Of Arthur F.Appellant
Reeder Distributors, Inc.Appellee
Rhea, Arthur F. On Behalf OfAppellant
Rhea, Billie J. Indiv.Appellant
Rhea, Billy J. Indiv.Appellant
Williams, Garry LynnAppellee
Trial Court Information
236th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Sharen Wilson
236-101097-