judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8307
A-8307
03/23/1961
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS LIQUOR CONTROL BOARD, ET AL.
A AND A LIQUOR STORES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/26/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/21/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
03/23/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/1961Response to Motion filed
05/26/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/21/1961Response to Petition
04/04/1961Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
03/23/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/23/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
A and A Liquor Stores, et al.Respondent
Texas Liquor Control Board, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information