judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NORTON F. TENNILLE V. CHERYL L. TENNILLE

Case Information: 00-CV-0924
Short Caption:NORTON F. TENNILLE V. CHERYL L. TENNILLEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 99-CV-1001 Consolidated:00-CV-0924
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA6964-97Filed Date:07/13/2000

Opening Event Date:07/13/2000Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/18/2000Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/20/2001
Argued/Submitted:09/05/2001
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/08/2002

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNorton F. Tennille N
Jonathan M. DanaYY
AppelleeCheryl L. Tennille N
Anne Meister NN
Allie J. Sheffield YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/13/2000NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2000APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT (Rt Ordered)
07/20/2000$50.00 DOCKETING FEE
07/20/2000DESIGNATION OF RECORD
07/20/2000STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
08/31/2000ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE and appeals nos. 1001 and 00-cv-924 are consolidated for all purposes hererin. (more)
08/31/2000ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEFto the extent that this court will issue a briefing scheduled for both appeals once the complete record on appeal has been filed in appeal no. 00-CV-924. (By: AMW) sw
09/19/2000APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for extension of time to file record on appeal 00cv924
09/19/2000MOTION(S) FEE PAID
09/20/2000COPY OF SUPERIOR COURT LETTER (dated 9/19/00)
09/20/2000RECEIVED - record on appeal
10/18/2000ORDERED: Grant the motion of appellant, and the lodged record is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: GP)
10/18/2000RECORD ON APPEAL
10/18/2000RECORD COMPLETED
10/18/2000RECORD CONTAINS TRANSCRIPTS
10/30/2000SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (8 pgs/tape) 1/29/99 proc.
11/27/2000APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/06/2000SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD # 3 5 pgs--Tanner) (7/10/98 proc.)
12/11/2000MISCELLANEOUS filed -- Errata Sheet by appellant to correct page references to the Record in Aplt's Brief -- The Errata Sheet w/b attached to appellant's brief -- dwm.
12/22/2000APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 1/26/01
12/22/2000MOTION(S) FEE PAID
01/26/2001APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 10 days. no oppo
01/26/2001MOTION(S) FEE PAID
02/05/2001RECEIVED - aple's brief
02/20/2001 On consideration of the motions of appellee for extensions of time within which to file the brief, no opposition having been filed, and the lodged brief of appellee, it is ORDERED that the motions of appellee are granted, and the lodged brief is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that these appeals shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (GP_) sw
02/20/2001APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/20/2001BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/26/2001APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
03/05/2001FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
03/06/2001LETTER TO COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING
03/09/2001LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING (Sheffield)
03/15/2001LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING
06/05/2001LETTER from appellee stating that mediation efforts have not been successful, and to schedule case for argument. ta
07/30/2001CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
07/30/2001error ta
09/05/2001FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/05/2001ARGUED (SC,RD,NE) Johnathan M. Dana, Esq., for appellant. Allie Sheffield, Esq., for appellee.
09/10/2001APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION (joint) for settlement conference.
09/10/2001MOTION(S) FEE PAID
09/28/2001ORDER GRANT APLT MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to schedule a settlement conference, it is ORDERED that the settlement conference in this matter shall take place on Monday, October 15, 2001, at 9:00 a.m., in the Kelly Hearing Room, District of Columbia Court of Appeals, 500 Indiana Avenue, NW, Washington, D.C. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties to this appeal be available by telephone during the conference for consultation with their attorney as necessary to approve any settlement terms that are achieved at the conference. (By SC, RD, NE)
09/28/2001ORDER On consideration of the joint motion to schedule a settlement conference, and the parties having conferred and agreed upon a date and time for the conference, it is ORDERED that the Honorable James A. Belson, Senior Judge of this court, is designated to preside over the subject settlement conference. (AMW)
10/15/2001SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD (Unable to settle). Case returned to division for decision.
12/04/2001SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (Rpt.Trans.-10/29/99 Proc.-30 Pgs.-Rpt. J. Hogue).
02/14/2002AFFIRMED Opinion
03/04/2002LETTER FROM COUNSEL regarding correction to opinion issued 2/14/02. (Sheffield)
03/08/2002MANDATE ISSUED
04/02/2002ORDER amending opinion on page 9. see order