judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY v. ULIOS RAY KING

Case: B-1303
B-1303
01/08/1969
Application for Writ of Error
ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
ULIOS RAY KING
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/31/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/31/1969Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
04/25/1969Post submission brief filedRespondent
02/07/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/30/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/08/1969Appendix FiledPetitioner
01/08/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/22/1969Response to Motion filed
07/31/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/31/1969Brief in Support of Petition
07/16/1969Opinion issued
04/25/1969Post submission brief filed
03/05/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/05/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/05/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/07/1969Reply to Response
01/30/1969Response to Petition
01/08/1969Appendix Filed
01/08/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/08/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allstate Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Ulios Ray KingRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information