judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRUZ-HERNANDEZ (JOSE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38280
Short Caption:CRUZ-HERNANDEZ (JOSE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010331Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/14/2002 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:10/14/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/07/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/07/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13334
08/20/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14052
08/20/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 11 and 12, 2001. To Court Reporter: J. Kernan. 01-14081
09/12/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 11, 2001 and June 12, 2001. Court Reporter: Julie Ann Kernan. 01-15379
09/13/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 6, 2001. Court Reporter: Julie Ann Kernan. 01-15518
12/06/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 4, 2002. 01-20511
01/07/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 01/04/02. 02-00325
01/07/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 02-00326
02/07/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 02/06/02. Signed by: Joseph R. Plater. 02-02481
03/01/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 2/28/02. Signed by Cheryl D. Bond. 02-03807
08/22/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 14, 2002, at 9:30 a.m. (NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA)
09/30/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/14/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA
12/11/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Young, C.J. and Agosti, J. Rose, J., dissenting. NNP03Y-CY/RR/DA 02-21151
01/07/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-00028
01/07/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/24/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 13, 2003. 03-00028