Case Heading (S-08-0271) | |||||
Case Number: | S-08-0271 | Case Docketed On: | 12/18/2008 | ||
Linked To: | S-08-0272 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury | ||
Short Title: | WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC., a Nebraska corporation, and CHERYL R. NEAL v. PETER D. BROPHY, by his guardian and conservator, Kate Brophy, and KATE BROPHY, individually | ||||
Full Title: | WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC., a Nebraska corporation, and CHERYL R. NEAL, Appellants (Defendants), v. PETER D. BROPHY, by his guardian and conservator, Kate Brophy, and KATE BROPHY, individually, Appellees (Plaintiffs). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Werner Enterprises, Inc. | Curtis B. Buchhammer Patrick J. Murphy Jason A. Neville Ryan Justin Schwartz |
Appellant | Cheryl R. Neal | Curtis B. Buchhammer Patrick J. Murphy Jason A. Neville Ryan Justin Schwartz |
Appellee | Peter D. Brophy | L. Eric Lundgren Gary J. Ceriani Valeri S. Pappas |
Appellee | Kate Brophy | L. Eric Lundgren Gary J. Ceriani Valeri S. Pappas |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Evidence, Trial - Damages, Trial - Jury Instructions |
Opinion Number: | 2009 WY 132 |
Citation: | 218 P.3d 948 (Wyo. 2009) |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
12/18/2008 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
12/18/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
12/18/2008 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
12/18/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
12/26/2008 | Motion - Other | Motion | Other | Final | |
12/29/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for admission of attorneys pro hac vice; and received proposed order. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/30/2008 | Order - Pro hac vice - allow. Order granting admission of attorneys pro hac vice (Gary J. Ceriani and Valeri S. Pappas) | Order | Pro hac vice - allow | Final | |
01/09/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Amended index | Notice-Incoming | Amended index | Final | |
01/29/2009 | Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellants. | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
02/02/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' motion for two-week extension of time | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/02/2009 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
02/18/2009 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
02/19/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellants Werner Enterprises, Inc., and Cheryl R. Neal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/02/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Amended index | Notice-Incoming | Amended index | Final | |
04/06/2009 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
04/07/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/24/2009 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
04/27/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
04/27/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellants | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/29/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from Counsel for Appellants | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
05/08/2009 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, eight volumes. Volumes I - IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Jury Instructions and Verdict; Volume VI - VII, Transcripts; Volume VIII, Exhibits). (Record filed four days late) | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
05/12/2009 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
05/14/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy for Werner Enterprises, Inc. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
05/18/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Gary Ceriani for appellees Brophy. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
06/02/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Additional authority | Notice-Incoming | Additional authority | Final | |
06/03/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Addititional Authority | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/16/2009 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Curtis Buchhammer and Patrick Murphy, argument by Mr. Murphy for appellants in S-08-0271; L. Eric Lundgren, Gary J. Ceriani, and Valeri S. Pappas, argument by Mr. Ceriani for appellees) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
06/16/2009 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
11/03/2009 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the Court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
11/19/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
11/19/2009 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
11/19/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
11/19/2009 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
11/24/2009 | Service - Certified mail signature return card | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |