judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LISA BROWN V. CORNERSTONE ACADEMY

Case Information: 10-CV-1459
Short Caption:LISA BROWN V. CORNERSTONE ACADEMYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5928-09Filed Date:11/18/2010

Opening Event Date:11/18/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLisa BrownYPro SeN
AppelleeCornerstone AcademyN
Deborah E. Kane NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/18/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/01/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 18, 2010, and it appea ring that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
12/17/2010 On consideration of this court's order of December 1, 2010, directing appellant to submit to this court a file-stamped copy of the motion for appeal transcript filed in the Superior Court, within 10 calendar days from the date of the order, but it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
12/17/2010DISMISSED
01/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED
09/15/2011FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Granted
10/11/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Reinstate Appeal
10/11/2011FiledMandate Recalled
10/11/2011FiledNo Transcript Needed
10/20/2011FiledRecord Copies
10/20/2011FiledRecord Index
10/20/2011FiledRecord Completed
11/01/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/22/2011FiledReceived ORDER dated October 11, 2011, mailed to appellant at 640 G Street, SE, Washington, DC 20003, and returned by the U.s. Post Office as "undeliverable" and remailed this date to 1640 G Street, SE, Washington, DC 20003. Our court records updated this date. 11/1/11, Briefing Order remailed to appellant at the current address this date. BA & APPDX due 40 days from today 1/3/12 (Appellant)
01/05/2012FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix accompanied by a motion for leave
01/30/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
01/30/2012FiledDismissed
02/21/2012FiledMandate