judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00343-CV
14-94-00343-CV
04/08/1994
Mandamus/prohibition
Johnson, Lillian
Scanlan, Jim, Judge of Probate Court No.3, Harris County
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/18/1994Case stored
04/14/1994Opinion issuedDENIED
04/14/1994Opinion issuedDENIED
04/13/1994Submitted
04/13/1994Submission
04/13/1994Submitted
04/11/1994Motion to stay trial court proceedings DISPOSEDDENIED
04/11/1994Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESDENIED
04/08/1994Motion to stay trial court proceeding FILED
04/08/1994Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
04/08/1994Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/18/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentHon. Edward W. Turley, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorLewis E. Cook
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentProbate Court No. 3 Judge
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 3
Harris
Honorable JAMES E. SCANLAN
263,845-401