judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00357-CV
14-94-00357-CV
04/08/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Moore, Larry
Hodge, Jerry, Et Al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/05/1994Case stored
12/01/1994Mandate Issued
12/01/1994Mandate Issued
11/21/1994Mandate due to be issued
11/07/1994Writ of Error RECEIVED
10/21/1994Motion for rehearing DUE
10/21/1994No motion for rehearing FILED
10/06/1994Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/06/1994Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/05/1994Submitted
10/05/1994Submission
10/05/1994Submitted
09/14/1994Submission
04/25/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/08/1994Transcript FILED
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/14/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
03/02/1994Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/01/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantLarry Moore
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeDan Morales
Trial Court Information
149th District Court
Brazoria
Honorable ROBERT EDWARD MAY
94I0013