judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00356-CV
14-94-00356-CV
04/08/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Moore, Larry
Collins, James A., Et Al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/01/1995Case stored
10/30/1995Mandate due to be issued
10/30/1995Mandate Issued
10/30/1995Mandate Issued
09/29/1995Motion for rehearing DUE
09/29/1995No motion for rehearing FILED
09/14/1995Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
09/14/1995Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
09/12/1995Submitted
09/12/1995Submission
09/12/1995Submitted
06/09/1995Case ready to be set
06/09/1995Case ready to be set
04/25/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/08/1994Transcript FILED
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/14/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
03/02/1994Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/30/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantLarry Moore
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeDan Morales
Trial Court Information
149th District Court
Brazoria
Honorable ROBERT EDWARD MAY
94I0013-1