judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00207-CR
04-94-00207-CR
04/07/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Gutierrez, Rogelio
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/07/2013Fee paid
07/02/1996Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
06/27/1996Mandate Issued
06/27/1996Mandate Issued
06/11/1996Case Returned from Higher Court
06/06/1996Higher Court DecisionRefused
05/22/1996Higher Court DecisionRefused
02/29/1996Information regarding cause received
02/28/1996Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/21/1996Appendix Filed
02/09/1996Petition for Review Filed
01/10/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/10/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/18/1995Brief Filed
10/18/1995Brief Filed
10/02/1995Brief Filed
10/02/1995Brief Filed
09/20/1995Submitted
09/20/1995Submission
09/20/1995Submitted
09/08/1995Motion to Reset Oral Argument DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/1995Submission
07/19/1995Mot. EOT To File Supp Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/13/1995Supplemental Brief Filed
07/13/1995Mot. EOT to File Supp Brief Filed
07/13/1995Supplemental Brief Received
06/22/1995Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/20/1995No Description Available.
06/20/1995No Description Available.
06/16/1995Motion Filed
06/15/1995Case ready to be set
06/15/1995Brief Filed
06/15/1995Case ready to be set
06/06/1995No Description Available.
05/23/1995Order Entered
05/23/1995Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/23/1995Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/1995Motion to Supplement Record Filed
05/18/1995Motion Filed
05/12/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/21/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/21/1995Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/1995Brief Filed
04/17/1995Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
04/17/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/17/1995Motion for Leave Filed
12/30/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/23/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/10/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/07/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
09/23/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/17/1994No Description Available.
07/27/1994No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
07/18/1994No Description Available.
07/13/1994No Description Available.
07/13/1994No Description Available.
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/06/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/22/1994Motion for New Trial Filed
03/15/1994Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/12/2011Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
06/27/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasDaniel Thornberry
Unknown UserCriminal - AppellantNelson Skinner
Becki Fahle
Trial Court Information
186th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Terrence W. Mcdonald
93-CR-4909
Thirty (30) years