judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRENCH (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38249
Short Caption:FRENCH (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42021 , 55758 , 58095 , 62812
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C173224Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/08/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/30/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/30/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-12834
07/30/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/6/01, 4/9/01 through 4/17/01, 6/19/01 and 6/26/01. Court Reporter: Patsy Smith, Renee Silvaggio and Marcia Harness. Filed in district court on: July 26, 2001. 01-12835
08/16/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 4/10/01; 4/11/01 and 4/12/01. Court Reporter: Marcia Harness. 01-13966
08/20/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 19, 2001. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 01-14054
08/27/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: April 6, 2001; April 16, 2001; and April 17, 2001. Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. 01-14461
08/31/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-14785
09/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed August 31, 2001. Court reporter or recorder Renee Silvaggio shall file the requested transcripts witin 10 days of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. The motion for an extension of time is granted. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed and served within 30 days of this order. 01-16011
10/01/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 19, 2001 and June 26, 2001. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 01-16509
10/19/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 01-17697
11/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 19, 2001. The clerk shall file the fast track stattement and appendix provisionally submitted on October 19, 2001. 01-18514
11/06/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-17699
11/06/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-17700
11/08/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to file 19 page Fast Track Response. 01-18643
11/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. On November 8, 2001, counsel for respondent filed a motion for leave to file a fast track response in excess of 10 pages. The motion is granted. The clerk shall file the fast track response provisionally submitted on November 8, 2001. 01-19792
11/27/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-18645
12/11/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief due: 40 days. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party shall file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 01-20735
01/16/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 02-01084
02/13/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. Signed by: Lynn M. Robinson. 02-02826
03/07/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. Signed by: Scott H. Waite. 02-04165
07/08/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-11551
07/08/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-15656
10/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-15825
10/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/21/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 10, 2002. 02-15825