judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FULGENCIO ERES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0251)
Case Number:S-08-0251Case Docketed On:11/21/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:FULGENCIO ERES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:FULGENCIO ERES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFulgencio EresDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Eric Alan Johnson
Eric K. Thompson
Ryan W. Podlesnik

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 42
Citation:227 P.3d 854

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/21/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/21/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/08/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/08/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and copy of Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/23/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
02/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received Brief of Appellee, Consent of Client for Eric K. Thompson and Ryan W. Podlesnik to appear and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/16/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ryan Podlesnik for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/24/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits; Volume V, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Public Defender; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General; Eric Johnson, Director, PAP; and Ryan W. Podlesnik, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Podlesnik for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/08/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/26/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/28/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/27/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal