judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD BARFIELD V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES

Case Information: 10-AA-1428
Short Caption:RICHARD BARFIELD V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:OAH-DOES558-09Filed Date:11/19/2010

Opening Event Date:11/19/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/19/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/19/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRichard Barfield YPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - UnemploymentN
Michael A. MilweeNN
Donna M. MuraskyNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/19/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc) Granted
11/19/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
12/02/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to November 19, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
12/02/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
01/19/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
01/19/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/24/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/02/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
03/02/2011APPENDIX
04/05/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 60 days
05/05/2011 On consideration of respondent's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the brief of respondent shall be filed on or before June 6, 2011. (JAC)
06/03/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 21 days.
06/22/2011 On consideration of respondent's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the brief of respondent shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing good cause. (JAC)
06/22/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/23/2011FiledTMC - motion for summary affirmance-OPPO
07/07/2011PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION to Respondent's Motion for Summary Affirmance.
08/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
08/09/2011FiledAffirmed
09/19/2011FiledMandate