judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-94-00047-CR
11-94-00047-CR
04/08/1994
Burglary
The State of Texas
Kirby, Jacy Kegan
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/31/1994Yearly opinion book
08/09/1994Mandate issued
08/04/1994Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/27/1994Mot. - To dismiss appeal filed
07/18/1994We send letter to lawyers, etc.
07/05/1994Inquiring on status, etc. of case
05/26/1994Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/05/1994Judgment of trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/09/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kirby, Jacy KeganAppelleeDon Richard
State Of TexasAppellantRick Hamby
Trial Court Information
118th District Court
Howard
Honorable Robert Moore, Retired Judge
8837
6 years prob/$1000 fine