judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0373-94
PD-0373-94
04/08/1994
PDR Case Type
FRAZIER, FRANK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/13/1994RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/01/1994FINAL DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/13/1994RESPONSE FILED
04/08/1994PDR FILED
04/08/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
FRAZIER, FRANKApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Kristine C. Woldy
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-92-01029-CR
AFF 3-3-94
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
338th District Court
Harris
Honorable Frank Price
591945