judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LITTLE (RANDALL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38250
Short Caption:LITTLE (RANDALL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010778Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/30/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/30/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-12837
08/03/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-13135
09/11/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-15312
09/11/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-15313
10/01/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-16488
11/01/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-18283
11/27/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-18336
11/27/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/06/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 30, 2001. 01-18336